ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS ALTON, HASLEMERE AND PETERSFIELD BRANCH

Charity number: 205153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £35.08k £38.74k £36.82k £37.13k £33.85k
Total expenditure £34.86k £20.87k £20.31k £40.28k £60.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A