Governance RSPCA Devon Branch
Charity number: 205154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 28 March 1962: Standard registration
- 24 July 2014: Funds received from 209547 RSPCA SOUTH DEVON BRANCH
- 24 July 2017: Funds received from 1159469 ANIMAL REHOMING CENTRE
- 29 November 2021: Funds received from 207708 ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANI...
- 08 March 2022: Funds received from 1000072 THE GRETA JOAN MINKS CHARITY
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- LITTLE VALLEY ANIMAL SHELTER (Working name)
- RSPCA EXETER, EAST AND WEST DEVON BRANCH (Working name)
- ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS EXETER, EAST AND WEST DEVON BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA - DEVON - EXETER, EAST AND WEST DEVON BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA - EXETER, EAST AND WEST DEVON BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA SOUTH EAST AND WEST DEVON BRANCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.