ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS PETERBOROUGH AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 205155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £231.03k £245.88k £253.43k £226.59k £195.70k
Total expenditure £221.12k £221.77k £227.04k £212.62k £173.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £38.53k