ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS OXFORDSHIRE BRANCH

Charity number: 205156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £50.83k £55.08k £55.08k £71.80k £51.80k
Total expenditure £57.01k £82.18k £82.18k £65.44k £66.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A