ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS OXFORDSHIRE BRANCH

Charity number: 205156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Thomas Trustee 14 October 2019 None on record
Nigel Heptonstall Trustee 30 June 2016 None on record
CLIVE OLIVER Trustee 31 August 2013 None on record
Brenda Tocher Trustee 13 July 2021 None on record
Sharon Annesley Trustee 26 May 2020 None on record
STEPHANIE RICHARDS Trustee 26 September 2011 None on record
Janet Thomas Trustee 30 June 2016 None on record
LINDA OLIVER Trustee None on record