THE GLOUCESTER CHARITIES TRUST

Charity number: 205177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity provides sheltered flats for older people in Gloucestershire as well as a Residential Home and Nursing Home. The Charity also offers day care services for those living with dementia in the wider community as well as a weekly social club. The Trust also administers a "Relief in Need" grant making branch of the charity and the former Gloucester District Nursing Charity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 May 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GCT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne Marie Clare Radley Trustee 20 September 2024
None on record
Howard Hyman Trustee 19 July 2024
None on record
Rylan Joseph Camplin Stubbins Trustee 19 January 2024
None on record
Gail Beverley Johnson Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
William Robert Hewer Trustee 22 September 2023
None on record
Lorraine Campbell Trustee 02 March 2023
None on record
Angela Margaret Conder Trustee 23 July 2021
GLOUCESTER MUSIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
Stephen John Heath Trustee 16 November 2018
THE A E ALLEN PERSONAL PENSION FUND
Received: On time
J L HANMAN BEQUEST
Received: On time
FREEMEN'S COMPENSATION FUND
Received: On time
Christine Mary Harber Trustee 16 November 2018
None on record
Martin Charles Collins Trustee 18 August 2017
PAINSWICK BEACON CONSERVATION GROUP
Received: On time
COMMUNITY LIBRARY IN PAINSWICK
Received: On time
Stephen Ayland Trustee 15 July 2016
None on record
LEE CHRISTOPHER HENSLEY Trustee 07 January 2014
FREEMEN OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Received: On time
FREEMEN'S COMPENSATION FUND
Received: On time
THE A E ALLEN PERSONAL PENSION FUND
Received: On time
J L HANMAN BEQUEST
Received: On time
Martyn White Trustee 20 June 2013
GLOUCESTER HISTORIC BUILDINGS LIMITED
Received: On time
LLANTHONY SECUNDA PRIORY TRUST
Received: On time
GLOUCESTER CIVIC TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
ASPIRE SPORTS AND CULTURAL TRUST
Charity is insolvent
PAMELA TRACEY Trustee 24 January 2012
None on record
Dr JANET CECILIA LUGG Trustee
None on record
GRAHAM GEORGE HOWELL Trustee
LLANTHONY SECUNDA PRIORY TRUST
Received: On time
FREEMEN'S COMPENSATION FUND
Received: On time
TERENCE LESLIE HAINES Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY CHURCH LONGLEVENS
Received: On time
THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE COUNTY PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £4.73m £4.72m £4.72m £4.65m £5.13m
Total expenditure £4.39m £4.36m £4.47m £4.95m £5.63m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £154.47k N/A £5.29k
Income - Donations and legacies £5.00k £1.06k £14.53k £96.03k £2.06k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.55m £4.57m £4.41m £4.56m £4.97m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £181.22k £148.43k £144.48k £154.26k £149.76k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £5.00k £0 £10.96k £93.96k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.35m £4.33m £4.43m £4.92m £5.60m
Expenditure - Raising funds £35.63k £33.07k £34.63k £36.15k £33.95k
Expenditure - Governance £10.20k £10.20k £10.20k £10.74k £11.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £35.63k £33.07k £34.63k £36.15k £33.95k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £11.85m £14.40m £16.45m £17.19m £16.76m
Long-term investments £5.53m £5.23m £6.07m £5.23m £5.55m
Other assets £3.02m £1.77m £1.73m £1.53m £2.72m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.27m £2.33m £2.33m £2.54m £2.29m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 21 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 07 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 07 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 04 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 04 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 19 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 20 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 20 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 2 FEBRUARY 1971 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 30 OCTOBER 1984.
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSE BRANCH - THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF GLOUCESTER AT TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
CITY OF GLOUCESTER.
Registration history
  • 29 May 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Montpellier House
Montpellier
GLOUCESTER
GL1 1LF
Phone:
01452500429