THE FAR FOREST AND DISTRICT HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 205210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 April 2017 On time Download