THE FAR FOREST AND DISTRICT HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 205210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £50.98k £53.38k £46.66k £39.44k £15.92k
Total expenditure £36.17k £40.41k £75.30k £44.68k £13.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £1.00k N/A £11.89k