THE SEAMEN'S FRIENDLY SOCIETY OF ST PAUL

Charity number: 205242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £10.82k £21.74k £12.88k £12.45k £12.67k
Total expenditure £6.94k £14.63k £12.52k £13.11k £13.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A