Trustees BERKSHIRE NURSES AND RELIEF IN SICKNESS TRUST
Charity number: 205274

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNE SERENA FARLEY | Chair | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
William Gibbons | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lina Damani | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Simpson | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LINDA PALMER | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN NEWHAM | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
FIONA CAMPBELL CONNOLLY | Trustee | 03 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL ANN ALEXANDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN CHRISTIAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET VIVIENNE WINTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.