ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WILTSHIRE-MID BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for animal welfare uses - neutering, spaying, microchipping, help with operations on animals, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 22 March 1962: Standard registration
- RSPCA WILTSHIRE-MID BRANCH (Working name)
- RSPCA WILTSHIRE-MID BRANCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Scull | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Madelaine Elizabeth Goodman | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Anne Davy | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Gough | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Davies | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PEARCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW SHEPPARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLEY PAWLAK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOANNE SHEPPARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.61k | £38.09k | £98.07k | £30.89k | £39.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.03k | £92.42k | £94.66k | £58.00k | £43.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
MID WILTSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 THE CLAY
EASTERTON
DEVIZES
SN10 4PB
- Phone:
- 01380812360
- Email:
- rspcawiltsmid@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window