Financial history HARVEY'S CHARITY, KNOWN AS THE FEOFFEES ESTATE

Charity number: 205486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £8.60k £9.51k £9.67k £8.68k £10.30k
Total expenditure £3.61k £7.06k £4.68k £1.65k £5.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A