Accounts and annual returns THE SOMERSET AND CORNWALL REGIMENTAL FUND

Charity number: 205588
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 March 2022 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 September 2022 327 days late
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 March 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 January 2019 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required