OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE FOR ROCHFORD AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 205814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £25.61k £26.69k £27.64k £68.31k £26.83k
Total expenditure £30.74k £31.37k £27.52k £29.03k £74.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.50k N/A N/A N/A