Financial history THE NATIONAL TRUST FOR PLACES OF HISTORIC INTEREST OR NATURAL BEAUTY

Charity number: 205846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £594.88m £634.34m £680.95m £507.66m £643.33m
Total expenditure £605.46m £653.10m £699.36m £514.54m £591.94m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.57m £16.70m N/A £19.95m £23.05m
Income - Donations and legacies £70.94m £84.18m £81.66m £63.51m £81.80m
Income - Other trading activities £81.78m £81.09m £88.10m £37.29m £63.23m
Income - Charitable activities £411.76m £440.01m £480.13m £385.03m £473.89m
Income - Endowments £118.00k £3.00k £8.03k £380.00k £185.00k
Income - Investment £29.17m £26.84m £29.18m £17.26m £15.84m
Income - Other £1.23m £2.22m £1.88m £4.58m £8.57m
Income - Legacies £51.94m £66.49m £61.57k £44.63m £63.57m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £533.70m £573.41m £614.06m £456.95m £536.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £71.76m £79.69m £85.30m £57.59m £55.18m
Expenditure - Governance £724.00k £829.00k £736.00k £358.00k £869.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £7.30m £10.44m £10.45m £12.99m £5.48m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0