Trustees THE NATIONAL TRUST FOR PLACES OF HISTORIC INTEREST OR NATURAL BEAUTY
Charity number: 205846

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rene H Olivieri | Chair | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lisbet Rausing | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Figgis | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tony Hall CBE | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Nichola Jagger | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aideen McGinley OBE | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Ernest Tew | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ade Rawcliffe | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE KAY | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ZARIN PATEL | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICK STACE | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Nairne CBE FSA | Trustee | 02 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.