Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BRISTOL AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 205858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Victoria Fay Farrelly Trustee 24 October 2022
None on record
Galina Staneva Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record
James Clifford Buck Burge Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record
Marie Helen Aitken Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record
Sarah Louise Richdon Trustee 09 November 2021
None on record
Jane Natasha Snow Trustee 29 April 2021
None on record
Helen Jane Paterson Trustee 04 May 2020
None on record
Christopher Michael Cowley Trustee 17 June 2019
None on record
Linda Harper Trustee 24 June 2013
None on record
JONATHAN PHILIP PARKER Trustee 03 December 1985
None on record