Accounts and annual returns ONSLOW ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 205893
Charity reporting is overdue by 242 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 242 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 242 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 March 2021 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 September 2020 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 September 2020 580 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 February 2018 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required