ROYAL HOSPITAL FOR NEURO-DISABILITY

Charity number: 205907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 04 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 04 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 31 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 03 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 03 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 13 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 13 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 28 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 11 April 2017 On time Download