ROYAL HOSPITAL FOR NEURO-DISABILITY

Charity number: 205907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shoibab Ali Shah Trustee 22 April 2021 None on record
Deborah Hill Trustee 22 April 2021 None on record
DES BENJAMIN Chair 01 January 2015 None on record
RT Revd DR Christopher Herbert Trustee 14 April 2016 None on record
Les Broude Trustee 02 October 2014 None on record
Mark Cooke Trustee 29 January 2020 None on record
Deborah Sanders Trustee 12 April 2018 None on record
Anna Marks Trustee 12 April 2018 None on record
Dr David McKenzie Mitchell Trustee 28 May 2015 None on record
Julie Harding Trustee 12 April 2018 None on record
Yen Foung Tai Trustee 11 April 2019 None on record
Dominic Fairclough Trustee 31 October 2015 None on record
Hugh Rees Trustee 29 January 2020 None on record