THE CHARITY OF ADELA BROOKE

Charity Number: 205948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Ownership of a property

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £2
Total expenditure: £2

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 May 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • COMBE READING ROOM (Working name)
  • CHARITY OF ADELA SOPHIA HARGOOD BROCKE FOR COMBE READING ROOM AND COFFEE HOUSE (Previous name)
  • CHARITY OF ADELA SOPHIA HARGOOD BROOKE FOR COMBE READING ROOM AND COFFEE HOUSE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Ralph James Williamson Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Andrew Hobson Trustee 18 July 2018
COMBE COMMUNITY HUB
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5 £5 £5 £2 £2
Total expenditure £5 £5 £5 £2 £2
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 August 2024 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 November 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Old Stable
Park Road
Combe
WITNEY
OX29 8NA
Phone:
01993891273
Website:

No information available