THE ORLAND TRUST AND DYKE'S GIFT

Charity number: 205986
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 March 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required