THE ORLAND TRUST AND DYKE'S GIFT

Charity number: 205986
Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.69k £2.58k £656 £753 £713
Total expenditure £2.21k £158 £1.00k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A