MANUDEN UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 205990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.21k £1.25k £1.26k £1.27k £529
Total expenditure £850 £1.15k £1.00k £1.35k £1.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A