Accounts and annual returns THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE QUEEN VICTORIA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HERNE BAY

Charity number: 205992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 20 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 19 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 19 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 07 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 17 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 17 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window