THE GIFT OF THOMAS POCKLINGTON

Charity number: 205996
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Overdue Overdue by 5219 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 29 December 2006 On time
Annual return 31 March 2005 03 February 2006 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 02 August 2005 On time
Annual return 31 March 2004 03 November 2004 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 03 November 2004 On time