COMBAT STRESS

Charity number: 206002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 February 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 February 2019 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time Download