Governance COMBAT STRESS

Charity number: 206002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 13 November 2018: Funds received from 1144298 THE NOTTINGHAM & NOTTINGHAMSHIRE VICTORIA CROSS CO...
  • 22 July 2021: Funds received from 276844 MISS S M G ROSS TRUST
  • 27 October 2021: Funds received from 1171663 FARINGDON SENSORY GARDEN
  • 20 June 2022: Funds received from 1006623 OPEN DOORS
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • COMBAT STRESS (Working name)
  • EX-SERVICES MENTAL WELFARE SOCIETY (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property