JOHN LANE CHARITY

Charity number: 206030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.02k £15.08k £14.50k £16.18k £15.08k
Total expenditure £8.88k £6.81k £4.15k £4.15k £2.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A