HENRY AND BENEDICT HALL CHARITY

Charity number: 206043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity has two properties that it rents for people in need

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024

Total income: £9,443
Total expenditure: £19,030

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 May 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • HENRY AND BENEDICT HALL CHARITY (Working name)
  • STAUNTON ALMSHOUSES CHARITIES (Working name)
  • BENEDICT AND JOHN HALL (Previous name)
  • BENEDICT HALL AND SARAH RICHARDS CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Edgar Barter Trustee 04 April 2023
None on record
Janet Dyson Trustee 10 January 2023
None on record
Jane Langdon Down Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Charley Scotford Trustee 04 April 2019
None on record
Alison Davis Trustee 01 February 2018
None on record
Rachel Carwardine Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022 01/01/2023 01/01/2024
Total gross income £6.37k £6.37k £12.86k £9.44k £9.44k
Total expenditure £4.25k £5.32k £15.67k £19.03k £19.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2023 05 April 2024 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2022 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2021 04 January 2022 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 11 December 2020 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DEED OF 3 FEBRUARY 1657 AND P R VOL 19 P 106 AND SCEME OF 04.03.1960.
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF STAUNTON 2) PROVISION OF A ALMHOUSE FOR FOUR PERSONS.
Area of benefit
THE FORMER ANCIENT PARISH OF STAUNTON
Registration history
  • 07 May 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
White Horse Inn
Staunton
Coleford
GL16 8PA
Phone:
01594 834001
Website:

No information available