GEORGE PEABODY DONATION FUND

Charity number: 206061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £252.67m £131.25m £1.00k £0 £119
Total expenditure £176.56m £92.02m £187.00k £0 £19.74k
Income from government contracts £426.52k £417.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.54m £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £35.15m £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £29.29m £14.06m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £167.65m £97.41m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £17.44m £8.31m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £3.14m £11.47m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £111.03m £60.20m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £19.95m £6.86m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £45.58m £24.97m N/A N/A N/A