MARY BAILY'S CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Somerset
Governance
- 27 April 1962: Standard registration
- 04 December 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94 | £94 | £94 | |
|
Total expenditure | £94 | £94 | £94 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 19 June 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 09 May 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 11 May 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT WELLS 18.7.1928 U.R. VOL. 238 P 311 AND 312
Charitable objects
FOR MAINTENANCE OF ONE LADY OF GENTLE BIRTH WHO SHALL BE IN POOR OR INDEFFERENT CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF FROME (OTHERWISE FROME-SELWOOD)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window