C D CRIPP'S CHARITY

Charity number: 206117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.15k £1.38k £1.41k £1.46k £1.51k
Total expenditure £202 £202 £1.21k £2.59k £202
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A