THE BOX MOOR TRUST

Charity number: 206142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 02 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 02 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 02 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 06 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 06 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 26 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 17 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 17 February 2017 On time Download