Trustees THE BOX MOOR TRUST
Charity number: 206142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HENRY WILLIAM KIRK | Chair | 27 April 1995 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Wilson | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Schneiders | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Graham Russell French | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
NAT SIMS | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Steven Mansbridge | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDY COOK | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE MICHAEL TITE | Trustee | 21 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
PETER ABLETT | Trustee | 21 October 2005 |
|
|
||||
PETER PHILLIPS | Trustee | 21 October 2005 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS LESLIE FURNELL | Trustee | 22 April 1987 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.