THE JOHN GATES CHARITY

Charity number: 206208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 18 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required