Trustees THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF MEDICINE
Charity number: 206219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Paul O'Flynn | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Linda Patterson | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Margaret Rae | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Currie | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sanjay Shah | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Prof Henrietta Bowden-Jones | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr SAMANTHA SHINDE | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hamish Thomas | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Melita Irving | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nik Patel | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helene Menage | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Roger Kirby | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.