THE LONDON NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 206228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 20 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 20 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 03 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 03 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 22 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 22 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 29 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 29 January 2017 On time Download