THE LONDON NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 206228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £34.77k £48.25k £38.73k £31.72k £35.13k
Total expenditure £26.47k £36.44k £37.21k £41.76k £36.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A