THE LONDON NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 206228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Linnell Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
David Bevan Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Joanne Hatton Trustee 01 January 2019
SOCIETY FOR THE HISTORY OF NATURAL HISTORY Received: On time
Nick Rutter Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Kat Duke Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Gehan De Silva Wijeyeratne Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record
MR D HOWDON Trustee
THE SELBORNE SOCIETY LIMITED Received: On time
Maria Lucia Roberts Chair 01 January 2018 None on record
Dr Anke Lizbeth Marsh Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Ian Woodward Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
MICHAEL JAMES WEST Trustee
THE WARE SOCIETY Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARY THE VIRGIN, WARE Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN WARE Received: On time
Dr Elizabeth Andrew Trustee 05 February 2020 None on record