Financial history THE LONDON SOCIETY

Charity number: 206270
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £46.04k £66.23k £66.58k £56.07k £71.10k
Total expenditure £62.98k £55.82k £64.02k £51.59k £56.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A