ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS EAST NORFOLK BRANCH

Charity number: 206296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LESLEY ROGERS Trustee 21 June 2012
INGHAM VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
Linda Holland Trustee 16 April 2019 None on record
Jillian Brenkley Trustee 26 March 2019 None on record
Jade Martin Trustee 28 April 2021 None on record
Jean Playle Trustee 14 June 2021
KERRY GREYHOUNDS UK Received: On time
Carol McDermott Trustee 23 June 2017 None on record
Simon De-Lacy Adams Chair 28 April 2021 None on record