THE BURFORD AND UPTON AND SIGNET WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 206356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.90k £3.08k £2.61k £2.67k £2.21k
Total expenditure £2.89k £4.88k £3.03k £2.30k £2.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A