Financial history JESUS HOSPITAL

Charity number: 206368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/09/2016 29/09/2017 29/09/2018 29/09/2019 29/09/2020
Total gross income £61.95k £60.23k £64.49k £64.81k £65.12k
Total expenditure £83.52k £57.98k £56.61k £69.41k £62.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A