THE ACTORS' BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 206524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES BOLAM Trustee None on record
AMANDA HOLT Trustee 14 December 2017 None on record
Linda Regan Trustee 22 February 2018 None on record
KAREN GLEDHILL Trustee 18 September 2014 None on record
PETER JOHN BOURKE Trustee None on record
Rebecca Johnson Trustee 31 October 2018 None on record
Dr Eshwar Alladi Trustee 16 November 2020 None on record
BARBARA WHATLEY Trustee None on record
DAME PENELOPE KEITH Chair None on record
DAWN KEELER Trustee None on record
DAME SIAN PHILLIPS Trustee None on record
WILLIAM CHARLES ANTHONY GAUNT Trustee None on record
BRIAN MURPHY Trustee None on record
Nicholas Peter Simons Trustee 15 December 2016 None on record
Christopher David Luscombe Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF DRAMA STUDIO LONDON Received: On time
Rosalind Katharine Joan Shanks Trustee None on record
John Burrell Trustee 23 May 2017 None on record
JULIEN COLHOUN BALL Trustee None on record
Marilyn Cutts Trustee 31 October 2018 None on record
Peter Harding Trustee 26 November 2015 None on record
COLIN NELSON BENNETT Trustee 19 November 2012
TRUST PROPERTY HELD BY TRUSTEES OF ST AUGUSTINE'S PRIORY Received: On time
BEACON HOUSE MINISTRIES Received: On time
Age Well East Ltd Received: On time
COLIN BENNETT CHARITABLE TRUST FOR THE HOMELESS Received: On time
THE TUDWICK FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE COLCHESTER AND TENDRING COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
Imogen Irving Trustee 16 November 2020 None on record