WYE'S CHARITY

Charity number: 206535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 02 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 16 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 02 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required