Accounts and annual returns REVEREND JOHN GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 206537
Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 94 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 94 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 11 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 02 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 10 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required