THE BATTLE CHARITIES

Charity number: 206591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.72k £3.43k £3.64k £3.70k £3.28k
Total expenditure £2.80k £2.25k £1.80k £535 £830
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A