THE BATTLE CHARITIES

Charity number: 206591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED 15 NOVEMBER 1929 (FRANCIS JOHNSON), WILL PROVED 28 DECEMBER 1928 (MARY JOHNSON).
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BATTLE
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
  • 09 August 2014 : Removed
  • 07 September 2014 : Re-registered