THE BATTLE CHARITIES

Charity number: 206591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Phillip Collins Trustee 21 July 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BATTLE Received: On time
Caryl Victoria Cook Trustee 15 March 2017 None on record
Paul Lewis Trustee 21 July 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BATTLE Received: On time
CHRIST CHURCH ST LEONARDS OLD BUILDINGS TRUST Received: On time
SHELAGH EVE FRANKS Trustee 14 October 2003 None on record
Paula Fisher Trustee 21 July 2021 None on record
The Very Reverend Lee Christopher James Duckett Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Christine Nuthall Trustee 19 October 2016 None on record
Mark Jonathan Blackman Trustee 16 October 2018 None on record
Ronald Cook Trustee 16 October 2018 None on record
SUSAN JENNIFER DEWAR Trustee 02 February 1988 None on record
Margaret Kiloh Trustee 22 March 2016 None on record